NC H630 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-246
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-246
Summary
Summary Ejectment/Trials.
Title
Summary Ejectment/Trials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Ch. SL 2009-246 | |
2009-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-24 | Pres. To Gov. 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-23 | Ratified | |
2009-06-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-21 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-21 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-30 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-03-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H630 |