NC H630 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Ch. SL 2017-41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Ch. SL 2017-41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rylan's Law/Family/Child Protect. & Acc. Act
Title
Rylan's Law/Family/Child Protect. & Acc. Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - M8 Re-Refer Homeless., Fost. Care, and Depend. (Y: 24 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Boles Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - M8 Re-Refer Homeless., Fost. Care, and Depend. (Y: 24 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Boles Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Ch. SL 2017-41 | |
2017-06-21 | Signed by Gov. 6/21/2017 | |
2017-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2017 | |
2017-06-15 | Ratified | |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-14 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2017 |
2017-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-12 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Homelessness, Foster Care, and Dependency, if favorable, Judiciary IV |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |