NC H631 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-240
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-240
Summary
Wearing of Medals by Public Safety Personnel.
Title
Wearing of Medals by Public Safety Personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gulley [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Richard Killian [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Ray Rapp [D] | Rep. Ray Warren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Ch. SL 2009-240 | |
2009-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2009 | |
2009-06-24 | Ratified | |
2009-06-23 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2009-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2009 | |
2009-06-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-16 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-16 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2009-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-21 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-21 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H631 |