NC H646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Ch. SL 2019-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

ID Approval/Flex Muni One-Stop

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ID Approval/Flex Muni One-Stop

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Ch. SL 2019-22
2019-06-03 Signed by Gov. 6/3/2019
2019-05-28 Pres. To Gov. 5/28/2019
2019-05-28 Ratified
2019-05-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-28HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-05-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-28HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-05-24HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-05-24SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-13SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-10HousePlaced On Cal For 04/11/2019
2019-04-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-09HouseRef to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseRules Suspended
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H646
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H646v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/156
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/155
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/245
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/463

Bill Comments

feedback