NC H664 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County Service Districts/Early Childhood Ed
Title
County Service Districts/Early Childhood Ed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Counties
County Commissioners
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
County Commissioners
Early Childhood Education
Education
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Minors
Public
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 301 | (n/a) | Citation Text |