NC H681 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Army Special Forces Reg Plate/Fees
Title
U.S. Army Special Forces Reg Plate/Fees
Sponsors
Rep. David Rogers [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |