NC H711 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Define Parental Rights Standard/Statutory Law
Title
Define Parental Rights Standard/Statutory Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |