NC H760 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Ch. SL 2019-193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expand Loss Prevention Investigations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand Loss Prevention Investigations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09 Ch. SL 2019-193
2019-08-09 Signed by Gov. 8/9/2019
2019-08-02 Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2019
2019-08-01 Ratified
2019-07-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-29HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-24HousePlaced On Cal For 07/29/2019
2019-07-24HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-23HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-23SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-23SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-23SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback