NC H796 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Emotional Support Animals - Rental Units

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emotional Support Animals - Rental Units

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - A1 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-05-06HouseSerial Referral To State and Local Government Stricken
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-04-18HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback