NC H804 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Kelsey Smith Act
Title
Kelsey Smith Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-29 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-08-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary IV |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |