NC H814 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-10 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fair Compensation for Mortgage Broker/Lender
Title
Fair Compensation for Mortgage Broker/Lender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-10 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Banking | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S559 (Same As) 2011-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Commerce