NC H843 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Students & Administration Equality Act
Title
Students & Administration Equality Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Education |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |