NC H92 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Ch. SL 2018-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Ch. SL 2018-7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cherokee Reg. Plate/Teaching Agreement
Title
Cherokee Reg. Plate/Teaching Agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Ch. SL 2018-7 | |
2018-06-13 | Signed by Gov. 6/13/2018 | |
2018-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2018 | |
2018-06-12 | Ratified | |
2018-06-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-11 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-07 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/01/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2017-02-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |