NC H926 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-500
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-500
Summary
Continuous Alcohol Monitoring Systems.
Title
Continuous Alcohol Monitoring Systems.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Jeff Barnhart [R] | Rep. Lorene Coates [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] |
Rep. David Guice [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-500 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-08-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-08-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1087 (Same As) 2009-04-20 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H926 |