NC H952 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Summary
Study Merit-Based Components/Teacher Salary.
Title
Study Merit-Based Components/Teacher Salary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Pre-School, Elementary and Secondary Education | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H952 |