NC H954 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-01 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-01 - Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Video Lottery Entertainment
Title
Video Lottery Entertainment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-01 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-09-01 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary 1 Added |
2021-09-01 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-08-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-08-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commissions
Computers
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Information Technology
Internet
Licenses & Permits
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Privilege
Public
Taxation
Taxes
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change
Computers
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Information Technology
Internet
Licenses & Permits
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Privilege
Public
Taxation
Taxes
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Title Change