NC H967 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Telemedicine Policy
Title
Telemedicine Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - House - A1 Blackwell Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-11 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-11 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-21 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Filed |