NC H968 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer Evidence Warehouse to DPS
Title
Transfer Evidence Warehouse to DPS
Sponsors
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] |
Sen. Shirley Randleman [R] | Rep. Timothy Spear [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-24 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Appropriations Subcommittee on Justice and Public Safety | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S881 (Same As) 2012-06-26 - Ch. SL 2012-83