NC S1073 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-557
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-557
Summary
Amend Alarm Systems Licensing Act.
Title
Amend Alarm Systems Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Sen. John Snow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-557 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Ratified | |
2009-08-04 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-06-10 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-19 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1073 |