NC S1078 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-412
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - Ch. SL 2009-412
Summary
Delay Bond/Probationer Arrested For Felony.
Title
Delay Bond/Probationer Arrested For Felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | Ch. SL 2009-412 | |
2009-08-05 | Signed By Gov. 8/5/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-28 | Ratified | |
2009-07-27 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-20 | Placed On Cal For 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-20 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-31 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1078 |