NC S1146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. SL 2010-17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Ch. SL 2010-17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cabarrus Fire District Boundary Validation
Title
Cabarrus Fire District Boundary Validation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Ch. SL 2010-17 | |
2010-06-23 | Ratified | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-03 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-01 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/1/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-17 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1723 (Same As) 2010-05-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance