NC S17 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Ch. Res 2011-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Ch. Res 2011-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Regulatory Reform Committee
Title
Joint Regulatory Reform Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Ch. Res 2011-2 | |
2011-02-22 | Ratified | |
2011-02-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-16 | Placed On Cal For 2/17/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-02-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-10 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-02-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Engrossed | |
2011-02-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-02-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-02 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |