NC S250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove Foreign Citizens from Voting Rolls
Title
Remove Foreign Citizens from Voting Rolls
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] |
Sen. Charles Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 59 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - M8 Re-Refer Appropriations Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - M8 Re-Refer Appropriations Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-10-02 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 57 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-11-06 | Vetoed 11/06/2019 | |
2019-11-01 | Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-23 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/08/2019 |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-10-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/02/2019 |
2019-10-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2019-08-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-08-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-08-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/21/2019 |
2019-08-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-08-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed |