NC S269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Durham Speed Device Pilot/School Zones
Title
Durham Speed Device Pilot/School Zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Filed |