NC S280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ch. Res 2019-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

SBCC Elections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SBCC Elections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCh. Res 2019-5
2019-03-21 Ratified
2019-03-20HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-19HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-19HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-03-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-03-19SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-18SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-03-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback