NC S302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Update ACH Svc & Care Plan/Bd of Nursing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update ACH Svc & Care Plan/Bd of Nursing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-16 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-18 Ratified
2019-07-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-16SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-15SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-10HousePlaced On Cal For 07/11/2019
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-01SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-30SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-18SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H325 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback