NC H325 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - Ch. SL 2019-159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Opioid Epidemic Response Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Epidemic Response Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 92 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22 Ch. SL 2019-159
2019-07-22 Signed by Gov. 7/22/2019
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-06-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-09HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-19HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-12HouseRef to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S302 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Pres. To Gov. 7/19/2019

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback