NC S303 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulatory Reform Act of 2016
Title
Regulatory Reform Act of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A2 Ross Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A2 Ross Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A1 Millis Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-16 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2016-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance |
2016-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-23 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Filed |