NC S310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Ch. SL 2019-17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Electric Co-Op Rural Broadband Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Co-Op Rural Broadband Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30 Ch. SL 2019-17
2019-05-30 Signed by Gov. 5/30/2019
2019-05-28 Pres. To Gov. 5/28/2019
2019-05-28 Ratified
2019-05-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-22HousePlaced On Cal For 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-22HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-22HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-22HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-26SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-26SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H387 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback