NC S359 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Ch. SL 2009-431
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Ch. SL 2009-431
Summary
Incorporate Sneads Ferry.
Title
Incorporate Sneads Ferry.
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Ch. SL 2009-431 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred On 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-03 | Rec To Concur In H Amend | |
2009-08-03 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-03 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-30 | Postponed To 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-17 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-06-15 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-10 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-03 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-03-02 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S359 |