NC S382 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Water Supply/Water Quality Laws
Title
Amend Water Supply/Water Quality Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 0 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A2 Luebke\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Blust\Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading\M4 Previous\Question (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 70 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A2 Luebke\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Blust\Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-07-03 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-03 | Conf Report Failed | |
2012-07-03 | Placed On Cal For 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Reconsidered Adoption | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Report Failed | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-07-02 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-28 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-26 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-22 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Filed |