NC S390 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

DuPont State Forest-Financial Study

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DuPont State Forest-Financial Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-22HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-18HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-18SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-28SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback