NC S432 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revise Probate Code
Title
Revise Probate Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-344 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-12 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-28 | Filed |