NC S434 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Merger of Certain Sewerage Districts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merger of Certain Sewerage Districts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-05-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09SenateRe-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2019-04-09SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback