NC S463 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Ch. SL 2014-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Ch. SL 2014-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Jail Dormitory Minimum Standards
Title
Jail Dormitory Minimum Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Ch. SL 2014-22 | |
2014-06-24 | Signed by Gov. 6/24/2014 | |
2014-06-19 | Pres. To Gov. 06/19/2014 | |
2014-06-18 | Ratified | |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2014 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2014-06-12 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2014-05-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-07-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Government |
2013-07-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Com Amend Adpt & Engross 1 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav As Amended |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Filed |