NC S476 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-08 - Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
NC Captive Insurance Act
Title
NC Captive Insurance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-06 | Engrossed | |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H473 (Same As) 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-116