NC S489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DHHS Child Support Recommendations.-AB
Title
DHHS Child Support Recommendations.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H297 (Same As) 2015-10-01 - Ch. SL 2015-265