NC S507 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Exception/Real Estate Broker Laws
Title
Clarify Exception/Real Estate Broker Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Harris Blake [R] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. Debbie Clary [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] |
Sen. James Forrester [R] | Sen. Neal Hunt [R] | Sen. Jean Preston [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-235 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-14 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-05 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-04-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-04 | Filed |