NC S584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Ch. SL 2019-198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Law Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-07-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14 Ch. SL 2019-198
2019-08-14 Signed by Gov. 8/14/2019
2019-08-08 Pres. To Gov. 8/8/2019
2019-08-07 Ratified
2019-08-06SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-06SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-08-05SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-31HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-31HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 07/31/2019
2019-07-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-30HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-13HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1010 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback