NC S63 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Permit Req. Collection Agency E'ee
Title
Clarify Permit Req. Collection Agency E'ee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-320 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-26 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-14 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-02-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |