NC S717 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
PED/Military Occupational Licensure
Title
PED/Military Occupational Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-03 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Amend Recon A1 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Reconsidered 2nd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1053 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Ch. SL 2020-87