NC S745 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Ch. SL 2012-4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Ch. SL 2012-4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Beer Franchise Law Clarifications
Title
Beer Franchise Law Clarifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Ch. SL 2012-4 | |
2012-06-04 | Signed By Gov. 6/4/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Pres. To Gov. 5/25/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Ratified | |
2012-05-24 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/24/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-05-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/23/2012 | |
2012-05-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-05-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2011-06-07 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H764 (Same As) 2011-05-18 - Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control