NC S76 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Ch. SL 2011-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Ch. SL 2011-3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TC: Eligibility: Indus Facil/Fix Uwharrie Com
Title
TC: Eligibility: Indus Facil/Fix Uwharrie Com
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Ch. SL 2011-3 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed By Gov. 3/9/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Pres. To Gov. 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Ratified | |
2011-03-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Placed On Cal For 3/7/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-01 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-16 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-02-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |