NC S76 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Ch. SL 2013-365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Domestic Energy Jobs Act
Title
Domestic Energy Jobs Act
Sponsors
Sen. Eldon Newton [R] | Sen. Robert Rucho [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] |
Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-23 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-22 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 8 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-06-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A3 Hager Third Reading (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A2 Hager Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-22 - House - C RPT Adopted (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 8 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-06-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A3 Hager Third Reading (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A2 Hager Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-06-07 - House - A1 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - Senate - (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | Ch. SL 2013-365 | |
2013-07-29 | Signed by Gov. 7/29/2013 | |
2013-07-25 | Pres. To Gov. 07/25/2013 | |
2013-07-24 | Ratified | |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-22 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2013-07-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013 |
2013-07-21 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2013 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2013-06-20 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-06-07 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-07 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2013-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-07 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-06-07 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2013-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2013 |
2013-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2013-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-05 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2013-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Finance |
2013-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-02-27 | Engrossed | |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amend Failed A6 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A5 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment Offered A3 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Commerce |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |