NC S792 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State IT Contracts/Contractor Liability
Title
State IT Contracts/Contractor Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-85 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 06/27/2016 | |
2016-06-27 | Ratified | |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2016 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2016 |
2016-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-27 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2016-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Information Technology |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1036 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I