NC S808 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
Pending: House Commerce and Job Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes to Commerce Reporting Requirements
Title
Changes to Commerce Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2012-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-05 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-04 | Engrossed | |
2012-06-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-04 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-05-31 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-21 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2012-05-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1017 (Same As) 2012-05-22 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development