NC S866 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-03 - Ch. SL 2010-189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Retiring of State Flags

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retiring of State Flags

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-03 Ch. SL 2010-189
2010-08-03 Signed By Gov. 8/3/2010
2010-07-02 Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2010
2010-07-01 Ratified
2010-06-30 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-06-29 Reptd Fav To Concur
2010-06-22 Ref To Com On Judiciary II
2010-06-22 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-06-22 Rec From House
2010-06-21 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2010-06-10 Postponed To 6/21/2010
2010-06-09 Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010
2010-06-09 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-06-09 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-19 serial referral stricken bill is re-referred to Judiciary III
2010-05-19 Withdrawn From Com
2009-05-18 Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I
2009-05-18 Passed 1st Reading
2009-05-13 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-05-12 Reptd Fav
2009-03-26 Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2009-03-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1230 (Same As) 2009-04-09 - Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback