NC S888 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ethics Requirements for MPOs/RPOs
Title
Ethics Requirements for MPOs/RPOs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-07 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Judiciary | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-05-24 | Ref To Com On Transportation | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |