NC S929 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-437
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Ch. SL 2009-437
Summary
No Set Aside of Bond Forfeit/Actual Notice.
Title
No Set Aside of Bond Forfeit/Actual Notice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Ch. SL 2009-437 | |
2009-08-07 | Signed By Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Ratified | |
2009-07-29 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/29/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-07-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S929 |