NC S94 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Summary
Felony to Assault Probation/Parole Officer.
Title
Felony to Assault Probation/Parole Officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Pending #1 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-10 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-02-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S94 |